Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 06/26/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/23/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/02/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/02/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/02/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/12/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/20/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/03/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/03/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/11/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/16/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/16/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/18/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/18/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/02/2015