There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Duplication Elimination Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Pay-As-You-Go-Act of 2010 to create an expedited procedure to enact recommendations of the Government Accountability Office for consolidation and elimination to reduce duplication.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/26/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/17/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/10/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/31/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/17/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/11/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/26/2013 Referred to
House Rules06/26/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2506. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2013)

Duplication Elimination Act of 2013 - Requires the President, within 90 days after publication of the annual Government Accountability Office (GAO) report on duplication, consolidation, and elimination of duplicative government programs, to send Congress a proposed joint resolution accompanied by a special message specifying:

  • any recommendations outlined in the GAO report that are excluded from the proposed joint resolution;
  • in detail why they were excluded; and
  • the outlined GAO recommendations included in the proposed joint resolution.

Limits the proposed joint resolution to one that: (1) makes legislative changes needed to carry out the recommendations contained in the GAO report for a year that the President did not exclude, and (2) requires that any savings attributable to the legislative changes be transferred to the General Fund of the Treasury and be used to reduce the deficit.

Sets forth procedures for expedited congressional consideration of the proposed joint resolution.