Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/17/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/13/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/04/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/04/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/14/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/11/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/11/2014