Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/25/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/16/2013