Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 06/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/23/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/29/2014