There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide veterans with counseling and treatment for sexual trauma that occurred during inactive duty training.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/28/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4861)
06/26/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
06/02/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/28/2014-5:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4861)
05/28/2014-5:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2527.
05/28/2014-5:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4861)
05/28/2014-5:40pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/27/2014HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/26/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/26/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/26/2013HouseIntroduced in House
06/13/2013HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3370)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/26/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/26/2013 Referred to
03/27/2014 Hearings by
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/02/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2527.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2527. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/28/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Extends a Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) program of counseling and care and services for veterans for sexual trauma that occurred during active duty or active duty for training to veterans who experienced such trauma during inactive duty training.