Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/28/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/22/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/09/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/27/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/04/2014