There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veteran Spouses Equal Treatment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to amend the definition of the term "spouse" to recognize new State definitions of such term for the purpose of the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/27/2013Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4096)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/03/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/03/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/03/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/23/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/25/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/29/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/23/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/23/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/23/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/08/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/10/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/10/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/17/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/23/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/24/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/24/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 08/01/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/11/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 11/13/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/17/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/02/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/02/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/27/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs07/08/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2529. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2013)

Veteran Spouses Equal Treatment Act - Amends the definition of "spouse" for purposes of veterans' benefits provisions to require an individual to be considered a spouse if the marriage of the individual is valid in the state in which the marriage was entered into or, in the case of a marriage entered into outside any state, if the marriage is valid in the place in which the marriage was entered into and the marriage could have been entered into in a state. Includes as a state the District of Columbia, the Commonwealths of Puerto Rico and the Northern Mariana Islands, and U.S. territories and possessions.