Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/03/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/03/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/03/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/23/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/25/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/29/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/23/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/23/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/23/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/08/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/10/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/10/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/17/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/23/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/24/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/24/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 08/01/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/11/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 11/13/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/17/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/02/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/02/2014