Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 06/27/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/17/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/07/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/14/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/14/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/27/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/06/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/28/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/24/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/26/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/08/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/09/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/20/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/29/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/09/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/17/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/17/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/17/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/18/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/23/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/25/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/25/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/26/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/26/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/08/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/09/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/10/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/16/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/17/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/23/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/23/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/24/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/28/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/30/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/31/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/31/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/31/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/31/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/31/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 08/01/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/15/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/15/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/15/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/13/2014