Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/10/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 03/13/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/28/2014