Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/08/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/24/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/09/2013