Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 10/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/10/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/09/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/30/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/18/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/18/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/18/2014