Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/28/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/28/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/17/2014