Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/19/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/19/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/22/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/22/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/29/2014