There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend certain definitions contained in the Provo River Project Transfer Act for purposes of clarifying certain property descriptions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
07/25/2014Became Public Law No: 113-129. (TXT | PDF)
07/25/2014Signed by President.
07/15/2014Presented to President.
07/09/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4355-4364; text as passed Senate: CR S4355)
12/03/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 615).(text: CR H7419)
09/10/2013Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-200.
01/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/25/2014Became Public Law No: 113-129. (TXT | PDF)
07/25/2014Signed by President.
07/15/2014HousePresented to President.
07/10/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/09/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4355-4364; text as passed Senate: CR S4355)
12/09/2013SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256.
12/03/2013-2:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 615). (text: CR H7419)
12/03/2013-2:10pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7426-7427)
12/03/2013-1:27pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/03/2013-1:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 255.
12/03/2013-1:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7419-7420)
12/03/2013-1:23pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/10/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 147.
09/10/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-200.
07/31/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/31/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/31/2013HouseSubcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
05/23/2013HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
01/31/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/15/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/15/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/15/2013 Referred to
07/31/2013 Markup by
09/10/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-200
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power01/31/2013 Referred to
05/23/2013 Hearings by
07/31/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.255. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-129 (07/25/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Provo River Project Transfer Act to modify the definition of: (1) "Pleasant Grove Property" to mean a specified parcel of land in Utah acquired by the United States for the Provo River Project, Deer Creek Division, as in existence on the date on which the parcel is conveyed under such Act; and (2) "Provo Reservoir Canal" to mean the water conveyance facility historically known as the Provo Reservoir Canal and associated bridges, fixtures, structures, facilities, lands, interests in land, and rights-of-way held, acquired, constructed, or improved by the United States as part of such Project, extending from, and including, the Murdock Diversion Dam and forebay at the mouth of Provo Canyon, including the Provo Reservoir Canal Siphon and Penstock near the Jordan Narrows to the point where water is discharged to the Welby-Jacob Canal and the Utah Lake Distributing Canal, as in existence on the date on which the Provo Reservoir Canal is conveyed under such Act.