Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/17/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/22/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/24/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/24/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/01/2014