Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/31/2013