Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/22/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2013