Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/31/2013