Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/24/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 07/24/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/21/2014