Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/20/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 12/19/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/10/2014