Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/11/2014