Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/23/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/21/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/05/2014