Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/18/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/24/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/22/2013