Text: H.R.2575 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (04/08/2014)

 
[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 2575 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]

                                                       Calendar No. 350
113th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 2575


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             April 7, 2014

                    Received and read the first time

                             April 8, 2014

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
   To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 30-hour 
 threshold for classification as a full-time employee for purposes of 
the employer mandate in the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act 
                     and replace it with 40 hours.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Save American Workers Act of 2014''.

SEC. 2. REPEAL OF 30-HOUR THRESHOLD FOR CLASSIFICATION AS FULL-TIME 
              EMPLOYEE FOR PURPOSES OF THE EMPLOYER MANDATE IN THE 
              PATIENT PROTECTION AND AFFORDABLE CARE ACT AND 
              REPLACEMENT WITH 40 HOURS.

    (a) Full-Time Equivalents.--Paragraph (2) of section 4980H(c) of 
the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended--
            (1) by repealing subparagraph (E), and
            (2) by inserting after subparagraph (D) the following new 
        subparagraph:
                    ``(E) Full-time equivalents treated as full-time 
                employees.--Solely for purposes of determining whether 
                an employer is an applicable large employer under this 
                paragraph, an employer shall, in addition to the number 
                of full-time employees for any month otherwise 
                determined, include for such month a number of full-
                time employees determined by dividing the aggregate 
                number of hours of service of employees who are not 
                full-time employees for the month by 174.''.
    (b) Full-Time Employees.--Paragraph (4) of section 4980H(c) of the 
Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended--
            (1) by repealing subparagraph (A), and
            (2) by inserting before subparagraph (B) the following new 
        subparagraph:
                    ``(A) In general.--The term `full-time employee' 
                means, with respect to any month, an employee who is 
                employed on average at least 40 hours of service per 
                week.''.
    (c) Effective Date.--The amendments made by this section shall 
apply to months beginning after December 31, 2013.

            Passed the House of Representatives April 3, 2014.

            Attest:

                                                 KAREN L. HAAS,

                                                                 Clerk.
                                                       Calendar No. 350

113th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                               H. R. 2575

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT

   To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 30-hour 
 threshold for classification as a full-time employee for purposes of 
the employer mandate in the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act 
                     and replace it with 40 hours.

_______________________________________________________________________

                             April 8, 2014

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

Share This