Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 08/01/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/10/2014