Text: H.R.2578 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2578


To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend for one year the hold harmless provision for small rural hospitals and sole community hospitals under the Medicare prospective payment system for hospital outpatient department services, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

June 28, 2013

Mr. Braley of Iowa introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend for one year the hold harmless provision for small rural hospitals and sole community hospitals under the Medicare prospective payment system for hospital outpatient department services, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Rural Hospital Fairness Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. One-year extension of outpatient hold harmless provision.

(a) In general.—Section 1833(t)(7)(D)(i) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395l(t)(7)(D)(i)), as amended by section 3002(a) of the Middle Class Tax Relief and Job Creation Act of 2012 (Public Law 112–96), is amended—

(1) in subclause (II)—

(A) in the first sentence, by striking “January 1, 2013” and inserting “January 1, 2014”; and

(B) in the second sentence, by striking “or 2012” and inserting “, 2012, or 2013”; and

(2) in subclause (III)—

(A) in the first sentence, by striking “January 1, 2013” and inserting “January 1, 2014”; and

(B) in the second sentence, by striking “March 1, 2012” and inserting “January 1, 2014”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendments made by subsection (a) shall take effect as if included in the enactment of section 3002 of the Middle Class Tax Relief and Job Creation Act of 2012 (Public Law 112–96).