Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/11/2013