Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/31/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 08/02/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/12/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/28/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/21/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/12/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/10/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/10/2014