Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/18/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-243.
12/18/2014 Signed by President.
12/16/2014 Presented to President.
12/13/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6819)
12/11/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9292)
12/11/2014 Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
06/28/2013 Introduced in House