Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/28/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/09/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/10/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/11/2014