There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Caroline Pryce Walker Conquer Childhood Cancer Reauthorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish programs with respect to childhood, adolescent, and young adult cancer.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/28/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/05/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/28/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/28/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/28/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/24/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/24/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/31/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/01/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/01/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/19/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/13/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/05/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/27/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/09/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/21/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/10/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/26/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/08/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/08/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/08/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/09/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/11/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/16/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/16/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/18/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/13/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/28/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/05/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2607. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/2013)

Caroline Pryce Walker Conquer Childhood Cancer Reauthorization Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize through FY2018 cancer research programs under the Caroline Pryce Walker Conquer Childhood Cancer Act of 2008.

Replaces the current pediatric cancer research and awareness grant program carried out by the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) with a comprehensive children's cancer biorepositories program.

Authorizes the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to make awards to eligible applicants to build upon existing initiatives to collect biospecimens and clinical and demographic information (including date of diagnosis, age at diagnosis, and patient's gender, race, and ethnicity) for at least 90% of all children, adolescents, and young adults with cancer in Comprehensive Children's Cancer Biorepositories for the purpose of achieving a better understanding of the cause of such cancers and the effects of treatments.

Permits award amounts to be used to: (1) acquire, preserve, and store high quality, donated biospecimens and associated clinical and demographic information on children, adolescents, and young adults diagnosed with cancer in the United States; (2) maintain a secure searchable database for scientists and qualified health care professionals to research such biospecimens and data; and (3) make available and distribute such biospecimens and data to researchers and professionals for peer-reviewed research.

Revises the national childhood cancer registry grant program to require the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to award grants to state cancer registries to enhance and expand infrastructure to track the epidemiology of cancer in children, adolescents, and young adults.

Requires a Comptroller General (GAO) report regarding the barriers to conducting pediatric studies of oncologic therapies in applications for new drugs or biological products under the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act, including recommendations to improve development and access to new therapies as well as assessments of: (1) the feasibility of requiring studies for a pediatric oncologic indication if the therapeutic target of a drug or biologic product for an adult oncologic indication is highly relevant to any pediatric cancer to which it could apply, and (2) the impact of altering the current exemption for orphan drug designations relating to rare diseases or conditions.