Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/21/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/05/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/26/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/09/2014