Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/01/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2014