Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/15/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 01/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/20/2013