Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/08/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/08/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 07/08/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/10/2013