Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/26/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/19/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/17/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/07/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/07/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/11/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/09/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/15/2014