There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
01/31/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/15/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/15/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/15/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/15/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/01/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/05/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/13/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/09/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/15/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/15/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs01/31/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.262.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.262. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/15/2013)

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act - Amends the Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Act of 2010 to require such stamp to be: (1) made available to the public for an additional four years; and (2) offered in a a choice of five versions depicting an African or Asian elephant, a rhinoceros, a tiger, a marine turtle, or a great ape.