Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 07/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 07/09/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 07/09/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/18/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/24/2014