Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/24/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 08/01/2013