Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/26/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/30/2013