There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Foreign Aid Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the President to establish guidelines for United States foreign assistance, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/10/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/10/2013Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/11/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/30/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/03/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/08/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/08/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/08/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/03/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/03/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/30/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/16/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 12/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/10/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/10/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2638. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/10/2013)

Foreign Aid Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013 - Directs the President to establish guidelines for the establishment of measurable goals, performance metrics, and monitoring and evaluation plans for U.S. foreign assistance.

Requires such guidelines to provide direction to federal departments and agencies that administer U.S. foreign assistance relating to: (1) resource monitoring, (2) project and program evaluation, and (3) analysis of findings and generalizations and their applicability to proposed project and program design.

Requires: (1) each appropriate federal department or agency to begin using such guidelines within one year after their establishment, and (2) the President to submit a related report to Congress within 18 months.

Directs the President to require the Secretary of State to establish and maintain an Internet website to make publicly available comprehensive and accessible information on U.S. foreign assistance programs on a country-by-country and program-by program basis. Requires the head of a federal department or agency to brief Congress if specified information requirements are not met.

Authorizes a department or agency to use up to 5% of its foreign development assistance funds for activities under this Act.