There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stay in Place, Cut the Waste Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a review of efforts to reduce Federal agency travel expenses through the use of video conferencing and a plan to achieve additional reductions in such expenses through the use of video conferencing, to implement such plan through rescissions of appropriations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/10/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/10/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/17/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 01/10/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/28/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/31/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/31/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/27/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform07/10/2013 Referred to
House Appropriations07/10/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2643.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2643. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/10/2013)

Stay in Place, Cut the Waste Act of 2013 - Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to: (1) review and report on the extent to which federal agencies have reduced travel expenses by the use of video conferencing pursuant to Executive Order 13589 and OMB Memorandum 12-12-12; (2) develop a plan for fiscal years beginning with FY2017 to use video conferencing to achieve the lesser of a 50% reduction in federal agency travel expenses below FY2013 levels, or the greatest reduction in such expenses that the Director considers feasible; and (3) rescind amounts made available for travel expenses that are proposed for reduction under this Act.