Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 07/10/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/24/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/10/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/06/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/16/2014