Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/14/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/22/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/11/2014