Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/08/2014