Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/08/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/14/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/22/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/11/2014