Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/23/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/18/2014