Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 07/10/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 07/10/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/10/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/10/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/27/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/10/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/21/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/07/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2014